The Greenrose Holding Company Announces New Leadership Appointments
05 Agosto 2022 - 5:05PM
The Greenrose Holding Company Inc. (OTC: GNRS, GNRSW) (“Greenrose”
or the “Company”), a multi-state grower and producer of cannabis
brands and products
, is announcing two new
appointments to its executive team and board of directors,
effective August 2022. Bernard Wang has been appointed as the
Company’s new chief financial officer, effective August 8, 2022,
and Benjamin Rose has been appointed to the Company’s board of
directors, effective August 1, 2022.
“We are proud to welcome two finance and
cannabis industry veterans to our leadership team as we further
establish Greenrose as a growing multi-state operator,” said Mickey
Harley, CEO of Greenrose. “We believe Bernard and Ben’s
appointments help strengthen our leadership team and add valuable
cannabis expertise, as we continue ramping our operations in
Arizona and Connecticut and pursue additional expansion
opportunities. We look forward to leveraging their expertise to
deepen our current market footprint and improve our foundation for
long-term growth.”
Appointment of Bernard Wang as Chief
Financial Officer
Bernard Wang joins Greenrose as the Company’s
new chief financial officer following the resignation of its former
CFO, Scott Cohen, on July 14, 2022. Mr. Wang is a senior finance
and accounting professional with over 25 years of experience and a
track record in helping both public and private companies improve
their internal controls, accounting processes, and capital raising
initiatives. Prior to joining Greenrose, Mr. Wang served as the
interim corporate controller and director of accounting at Fat
Brands Inc. (Nasdaq: FAT), where he led multiple projects to
improve corporate reporting processes. He previously served as the
corporate controller and vice president of finance at Canndescent,
a California-based luxury cannabis flower brand company.
Mr. Wang has also held various senior finance
roles at Sony New Media Solutions, Vubiquity Inc., and
InterAmerican Motor Corporation. He received his BA in Economics
and BS in Accounting from California State University, Northridge -
School of Business Administration and Economics, and he is an
active member of the California Board of Accountancy, California
Society of CPAs, and American Institute of Certified Public
Accountants.
Harley continued: “With Bernard’s strong public
company, reporting, and cannabis industry expertise, we believe
that his leadership will help us strengthen our financial controls
and make continued progress on our growth objectives. We would like
to thank Scott Cohen for his contributions to Greenrose during his
time as CFO, and we look forward to working alongside Bernard on
our executive team.”
Appointment of Benjamin Rose to Board of
Directors
Benjamin Rose has been appointed to Greenrose’s
board of directors. With over 25 years of experience in the
investment industry, Mr. Rose brings extensive expertise with
helping cannabis companies raise capital and enhance their
operational foundation for growth. He is the founder and managing
partner of Boundary Peak Advisors LLC, a cannabis-focused
investment and advisory firm. Through his role at Boundary Peak,
Mr. Rose helped facilitate Greenrose’s $105 million senior secured
credit facility from DXR Finance, LLC to assist in the completion
of the Company’s qualifying transaction with Theraplant. He also
served as chairman of the board for MedMen (CSE: MMEN) (OTCQX:
MMNFF), where he spearheaded several restructuring and governance
improvements, as well as facilitated a backstopped $100 million
equity private placement led by Serruya Private Equity.
Prior to Boundary Peak, Mr. Rose founded and
served as the chief investment officer for Wicklow Capital, where
he focused on venture investments in seed to late-stage companies
across various emerging industries, such as cannabis, technology,
and cryptocurrency. He has also served as a portfolio manager at
Balyasny Asset Management and held various trading roles at Blue
Ridge Capital, Tiger Management, and Goldman Sachs. Mr. Rose earned
his BA in Economics from Harvard College, where he graduated with
honors.
Harley concluded: “Ben brings a seasoned
perspective to our board as we navigate our early days as a public
multi-state cannabis operator. We look forward to leveraging his
expertise in our continued efforts to improve our capital and
operational efficiency.”
About The Greenrose Holding Company
Inc.The Greenrose Holding Company Inc. is a multi-state
cultivator and producer of cannabis brands and products. Greenrose
is driven by cultivation. It is understood that being a leader in
the cannabis industry starts with outstanding flower derived from
sophisticated genetics and scalable grow methods. Greenrose aims to
be a vertically integrated company that looks for scale and
horizontal consolidation. For more information, please visit
www.greenroseholdings.com.
Investor Relations Contact:Gateway
Group, Inc.Cody Slach or Jackie Keshner(949)
574-3860GNRS@gatewayir.com
Greenrose Contact:Daniel Harley
Executive Vice President, Investor Relations(516)
307-0383ir@greenroseholdings.com
Greenrose Axquisition (NASDAQ:GNRSW)
Gráfico Histórico do Ativo
De Ago 2024 até Set 2024
Greenrose Axquisition (NASDAQ:GNRSW)
Gráfico Histórico do Ativo
De Set 2023 até Set 2024